U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00329
  • Case Name: Cody v. Muguira
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Request]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Request]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Request]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • December 02, 2015: [Letter]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Receipt]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 05, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order]
  • October 05, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Consent Filed]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 25, 2015: [Order]
  • August 25, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.