U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00233
  • Case Name: Wright v. State of Idaho
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2016
  • July 12, 2016: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • July 12, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 06, 2016: [Dismiss]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Hearing]
  • June 28, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 28, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • May 16, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 13, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 01, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Stay]
August, 2015
  • August 25, 2015: [Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.