U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00345
  • Case Name: Atain Specialty Insurance Company v. Mountain Resort Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Order]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 05, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • January 05, 2016: [Service by Publication]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 28, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 01, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 01, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 12, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order]
  • November 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • November 05, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 26, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 26, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 26, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • September 09, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 09, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 04, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 27, 2015: [Supplement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.