U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00344
  • Case Name: Rendon v. Office of the Mini-Cassia County Public Defender et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Receipt]
  • December 04, 2015: [Reconsideration]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • November 10, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2015
  • August 27, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • August 27, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • August 27, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 27, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 27, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.