U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00346
  • Case Name: Hathaway v. Clark County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2016: [Judgment Offer Accepted (Notice of Acceptance)]
  • December 14, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • February 08, 2016: [Consent Filed]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 04, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 25, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 25, 2015: [Continue]
  • November 25, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 02, 2015: [Order]
  • September 02, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 27, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.