U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Johnson et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 03, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order]
  • January 20, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 07, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 11, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • August 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Substitute Party]
  • August 28, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.