U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00348
  • Case Name: RE/MAX, LLC v. Corporate Identity Solutions, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • February 18, 2016: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • February 18, 2016: [Judgment - Consent]
  • February 16, 2016: [Approve Consent Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 23, 2015: [Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 14, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 08, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 01, 2015: [Order]
  • September 01, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2015: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • August 28, 2015: [Complaint]
  • August 28, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.