U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00347
  • Case Name: MWI Veterinary Supply Co. v. Kramm
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 08, 2015: [Errata]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 05, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order]
  • September 25, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • September 16, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 05, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 05, 2015: [Supplement]
  • September 01, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
August, 2015
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 31, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 28, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.