U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00326
  • Case Name: Cody v. Miller
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Letter]
  • October 02, 2018: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • October 02, 2018: [Special Verdict Form]
  • October 02, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 02, 2018: [Exhibit List]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 26, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • September 25, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • September 25, 2018: [Order to Transport]
  • September 24, 2018: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • September 24, 2018: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • September 20, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 07, 2018: [Strike]
  • September 07, 2018: [Exhibit List]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order to Transport]
  • August 29, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 29, 2018: [Order]
  • August 29, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 29, 2018: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • August 24, 2018: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • August 16, 2018: [In Limine]
  • August 16, 2018: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • August 16, 2018: [Witness List]
  • August 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 08, 2018: [Letter]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Letter]
  • May 03, 2018: [Appear]
  • May 03, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2018: [Letter]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 13, 2018: [Letter]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • February 01, 2018: [Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order]
  • January 23, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2018: [Letter]
  • January 12, 2018: [Proposed Special Verdict]
  • January 12, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 12, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 12, 2018: [Witness List]
  • January 12, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Order]
  • December 28, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 28, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 12, 2017: [Strike]
  • December 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Appear]
  • November 29, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • November 29, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 09, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Letter]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Request]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 18, 2017: [Request]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 25, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 25, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 22, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2016: [Strike]
  • November 17, 2016: [Request]
  • November 07, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 28, 2016: [Request]
  • September 07, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 09, 2016: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • August 03, 2016: [Request]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 07, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 05, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • December 23, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [Letter]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • November 19, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 28, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 01, 2015: [Consent Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.