U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00339
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [USCA Order]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 04, 2017: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
  • February 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • February 06, 2017: [Reply (generic)]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Response to Habeas Petition]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • July 13, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order]
  • June 30, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2016: [Letter]
  • June 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order]
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 24, 2015: [Letter]
  • September 24, 2015: [Receipt]
  • September 03, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.