U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00343
  • Case Name: Conerly v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2017
  • January 31, 2017: [USCA Order]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [USCA Order]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 11, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • February 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2016: [Response (generic)]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order]
  • December 09, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 04, 2015: [Request]
  • September 04, 2015: [Consent Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.