U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00352
  • Case Name: In Re: Wallace
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2015
  • November 13, 2015: [Excerpt of Record]
  • November 13, 2015: [Appellees Brief]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 20, 2015: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • October 19, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2015: [Attorney Fees]
  • October 14, 2015: [Appellants Brief]
September, 2015
  • September 10, 2015: [Order]
  • September 10, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 04, 2015: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
  • September 04, 2015: [Notice of Filing BK Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.