U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00354
  • Case Name: Hopkins v. Idaho Power Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Reference]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 15, 2015: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 08, 2015: [Withdraw Reference]
  • September 08, 2015: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.