U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00368
  • Case Name: Brummett v. Finn
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Response to Habeas Petition]
August, 2016
  • August 03, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 03, 2016: [Order]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 03, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 21, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • March 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 08, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 08, 2016: [Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Traverse]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 19, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 05, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 15, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2015: [Order]
  • October 05, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 05, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 05, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2015
  • September 09, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 09, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 09, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 09, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 09, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.