U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00394
  • Case Name: Limary v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Costs Taxed]
  • June 12, 2018: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • June 12, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • May 29, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 07, 2018: [New Trial]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Special Verdict Form]
  • April 24, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 24, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 24, 2018: [Witness List]
  • April 24, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • April 22, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 20, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • April 19, 2018: [Jury Trial - Held]
  • April 17, 2018: [Jury Trial - Begun]
  • April 17, 2018: [Jury Selection (sealed)]
  • April 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 10, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 10, 2018: [Objection]
  • April 05, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • April 03, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 03, 2018: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 03, 2018: [Trial Brief]
  • April 03, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 03, 2018: [Witness List]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • March 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • March 06, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • March 06, 2018: [In Limine]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • December 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 25, 2016: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 11, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 03, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order]
  • July 25, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2015
  • November 16, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 16, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 13, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 13, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Consent Filed]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 10, 2015: [Supplement]
  • September 10, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • September 10, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • September 10, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 09, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • September 09, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.