U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00423
  • Case Name: Chase et al v. Blue Cross of Idaho Health Services Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 17, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 02, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • February 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2016: [Protective Order]
  • February 08, 2016: [Strike]
  • February 04, 2016: [~Util - Set Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Supplement]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 28, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 07, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2015: [Consent Filed]
November, 2015
  • November 27, 2015: [Order]
  • November 25, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • November 10, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2015: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 09, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 09, 2015: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 02, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 16, 2015: [Dismiss]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.