U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00429
  • Case Name: Reilly et al v. Levin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 23, 2016: [Judgment]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 22, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 20, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • January 19, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • January 11, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • January 06, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 08, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 03, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 25, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 24, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 24, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 12, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 12, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2015: [Transfer Case]
  • November 05, 2015: [Transfer Case]
  • November 03, 2015: [Return Mail]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Return Mail]
  • October 21, 2015: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 15, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • October 09, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 07, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 15, 2015: [Complaint]
  • September 15, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • September 15, 2015: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.