U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00428
  • Case Name: Reynolds v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [USCA Order]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [USCA Order]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [USCA Order]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Letter]
  • December 17, 2015: [USCA Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 15, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • November 13, 2015: [Compel]
  • November 12, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2015: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • September 30, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 15, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 15, 2015: [Complaint]
  • September 15, 2015: [Compel]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 15, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.