U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00426
  • Case Name: Grijalva v. IDOC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • May 01, 2018: [Judgment]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 01, 2018: [Return Mail]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 01, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2016: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • November 10, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • November 10, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • November 10, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 14, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 17, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Compel]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • February 11, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order]
  • January 21, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 21, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • September 15, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 15, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 15, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • September 15, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 15, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.