U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00431
  • Case Name: Pernet v. Pocatello/Chubbuck School District #25
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Judgment]
  • November 28, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [ADR Plan]
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 15, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 09, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2015: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 06, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
September, 2015
  • September 16, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.