U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00421
  • Case Name: Rembiszewski v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 07, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 06, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [ADR Plan]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 13, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 12, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.