U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00432
  • Case Name: DeVan v. Corrections Corporation of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order]
  • May 02, 2017: [Request]
April, 2017
  • April 18, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 11, 2017: [Stay]
  • April 11, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 04, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • March 01, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • March 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 10, 2017: [Stay]
  • February 10, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 16, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • November 15, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 02, 2016: [Objection]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 13, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2016: [Request]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Quash]
  • September 19, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 15, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 26, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • July 26, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • July 26, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 26, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 06, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 17, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 16, 2016: [Request]
  • June 14, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 11, 2016: [Seal Document]
  • January 11, 2016: [Request]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Protective Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order]
  • December 10, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
November, 2015
  • November 04, 2015: [Letter]
September, 2015
  • September 17, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 17, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 17, 2015: [Complaint]
  • September 17, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 17, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.