U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00435
  • Case Name: Sailor v. City of Coeur d'Alene Police Department
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Judgment]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • December 16, 2015: [Hearing]
  • December 16, 2015: [Supplement]
  • December 16, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • December 04, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 08, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 07, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 07, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
September, 2015
  • September 21, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • September 18, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 18, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • September 18, 2015: [Complaint]
  • September 18, 2015: [Consent Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.