U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00437
  • Case Name: Chrapkowski v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 10, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • April 12, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order]
  • March 30, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2016: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 28, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 22, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2016: [Declaration]
  • March 22, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 09, 2016: [Declaration]
  • February 09, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2016
  • January 16, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2015
  • December 21, 2015: [Administrative Record]
  • December 21, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
October, 2015
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 20, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 19, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2015
  • September 24, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 24, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • September 21, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • September 21, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 21, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.