U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00436
  • Case Name: Klingensmith v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Order]
  • March 17, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2017: [Response to Motion]
February, 2017
  • February 08, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2016
  • December 05, 2016: [Letter]
  • December 05, 2016: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2016
  • March 12, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Administrative Record]
  • December 23, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 28, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 23, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 23, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • September 21, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • September 21, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • September 21, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.