U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:15-cv-00441
  • Case Name: Bruhnke v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Response (generic)]
  • March 17, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • January 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • December 22, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 18, 2015: [Administrative Record]
  • December 18, 2015: [Answer to Petition for Review]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Substitution]
  • October 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 23, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • September 22, 2015: [Petition for Review]
  • September 22, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.