U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00444
  • Case Name: Curtis v. LHP Pocatello LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 22, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 05, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 04, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • January 03, 2017: [Order]
  • January 03, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 23, 2016: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order]
  • September 30, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [ADR Plan]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • February 03, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • February 03, 2016: [Consent Filed]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 13, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • January 12, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 12, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 12, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 11, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 30, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 23, 2015: [Complaint]
  • September 23, 2015: [Receipt]
  • September 23, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.