U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00443
  • Case Name: Richardson et al v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order]
  • October 06, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 14, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 01, 2016: [ADR Plan]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 30, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 30, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 18, 2016: [Order CTO]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 25, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 04, 2016: [Response to Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order]
  • February 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 08, 2016: [Supplement]
  • February 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • January 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • December 03, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 30, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 30, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • November 25, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • November 24, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Notice of Removal]
  • September 28, 2015: [Supplement]
  • September 24, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 24, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • September 24, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 23, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • September 23, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.