U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00452
  • Case Name: Derrick v. City of Cascade, Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 09, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 15, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • February 09, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 15, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 25, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.