U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00449
  • Case Name: Evans v. USF Reddaway, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [USCA Order]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Costs Taxed]
  • January 26, 2018: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 26, 2017: [Objection to Bill of Costs]
  • July 26, 2017: [Errata]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 12, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 30, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2017
  • February 22, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Strike]
  • October 28, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 14, 2016: [Declaration]
  • September 14, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order]
  • August 05, 2016: [Settlement Conference]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2016: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Order]
  • November 20, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 20, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 18, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order]
  • November 10, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 19, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • October 19, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 19, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • September 25, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.