U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Gosch v. Fox et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Judgment]
  • June 10, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2016
  • March 02, 2016: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order]
  • March 02, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Declaration]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • December 18, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 18, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 04, 2015: [Stay]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Errata]
  • November 17, 2015: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 17, 2015: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • November 16, 2015: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 12, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 03, 2015: [Dismiss]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 20, 2015: [Request]
  • October 19, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 19, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2015: [Order]
  • September 28, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 28, 2015: [Certificate of Clerk]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.