U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-00425
  • Case Name: McDermott v. Carlin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Letter]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [USCA Order]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [USCA Order]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 23, 2017: [Notice of Appeal]
January, 2017
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Relief]
  • January 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 07, 2016: [Alter Judgment]
  • September 07, 2016: [Relief]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 16, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • August 01, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 07, 2016: [Default Judgment]
  • April 05, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 24, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • March 07, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 24, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 02, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • February 02, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 21, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 06, 2015: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Consent Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.