U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cv-00540
  • Case Name: Martin et al v. City of Boise, Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance Pro Bono/Fee Waiver]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Discovery Plan]
  • May 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2020
  • April 07, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • March 10, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Order]
  • February 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 15, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Pro Bono]
  • January 13, 2020: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • January 10, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance Pro Bono/Fee Waiver]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 16, 2019: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Letter]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Letter]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 09, 2019: [USCA Order]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • October 02, 2018: [USCA Order]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: [Declaration]
  • September 18, 2018: [Taxation of Costs]
  • September 06, 2018: [USCA Memorandum]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2017: [USCA Order]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • December 30, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: [USCA Order]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order]
December, 2015
  • December 02, 2015: [Return Mail]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • November 02, 2015: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • November 02, 2015: [Appeal Transcript]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 29, 2015: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2015
  • September 29, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2015: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
  • September 29, 2015: [Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.