U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00455
  • Case Name: Regan et al v. Otter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Judgment]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 11, 2016: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Errata]
  • February 08, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • January 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • January 07, 2016: [Consent Filed]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 28, 2015: [Dismiss]
  • December 28, 2015: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 28, 2015: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 28, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 26, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 26, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 26, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 30, 2015: [Errata]
  • September 30, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.