U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00350
  • Case Name: Wilcox v. Kelly et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 21, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 14, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 08, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2015
  • December 22, 2015: [Receipt]
  • December 14, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • December 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 08, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 20, 2015: [Sealed Document]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order]
  • September 30, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • September 30, 2015: [Certificate of Clerk]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.