U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00461
  • Case Name: Puxsasuppachat et al v. Keckler
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 31, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Status Report]
  • April 05, 2017: [Order]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • March 06, 2017: [Reopen Case]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 25, 2017: [Dismiss]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Answer to Crossclaim]
  • April 20, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 20, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • April 20, 2016: [Crossclaim]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2016: [Scheduling Conf Form/Litigation Plan]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 05, 2016: [Errata]
December, 2015
  • December 29, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 29, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • December 29, 2015: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 14, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 14, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2015: [Summons Issued]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 24, 2015: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • November 24, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 23, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 20, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 18, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • November 12, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 10, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.