U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00467
  • Case Name: BLOSS v. Twin Falls County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 24, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Witness List]
  • February 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • January 27, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 27, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • January 27, 2017: [Seal]
  • January 27, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 05, 2017: [Witness List]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2016: [Order]
  • October 19, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2016: [Service]
  • September 15, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 15, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 14, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 28, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • January 27, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 27, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 19, 2016: [Stay]
  • January 11, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2016: [Dismiss]
December, 2015
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Summons Issued]
  • October 06, 2015: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.