U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00471
  • Case Name: Egan et al v. East Idaho Credit Union
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Renew]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Strike]
  • December 07, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • November 18, 2016: [Renew]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 04, 2016: [Stipulation]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 11, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Order]
  • June 22, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 22, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • June 09, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 21, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2015: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [Complaint]
  • October 07, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 07, 2015: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 07, 2015: [Errata]
  • October 07, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.