U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00472
  • Case Name: Joyner v. Christon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 30, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • November 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 24, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 10, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 10, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 10, 2018: [Statement]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 06, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 01, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 12, 2017: [Receipt]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 04, 2016: [Letter]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Clarify]
June, 2016
  • June 17, 2016: [Request]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge]
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • March 11, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 07, 2016: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • March 07, 2016: [Disqualify Judge]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order]
  • January 08, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • January 08, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 08, 2016: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • January 08, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2015
  • October 07, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 07, 2015: [Complaint]
  • October 07, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.