U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00466
  • Case Name: Meyer v. Corizon Medical Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 02, 2017: [Letter]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • December 15, 2016: [Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 10, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of Substitution]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 02, 2016: [Response to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2016: [Settlement]
  • April 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 29, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 11, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 01, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 01, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 19, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • February 19, 2016: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 11, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 07, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2015
  • December 16, 2015: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 20, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 16, 2015: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 16, 2015: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • October 16, 2015: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
  • October 07, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 07, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 07, 2015: [Complaint]
  • October 07, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 07, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.