U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00470
  • Case Name: Palacios v. Cueva
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
December, 2015
  • December 18, 2015: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 02, 2015: [Redacted Document]
  • December 02, 2015: [Seal Document]
  • December 02, 2015: [Order]
  • December 02, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 02, 2015: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 01, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • December 01, 2015: [Order]
  • December 01, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2015
  • November 24, 2015: [Trial Brief]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order]
  • October 26, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 21, 2015: [Passport Surrender/Return]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order]
  • October 20, 2015: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 20, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 16, 2015: [Stipulation]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 08, 2015: [Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.