U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00474
  • Case Name: Nall v. Idaho Department of Corrections Cert Team Members et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 13, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 12, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 12, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 26, 2019: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 21, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • February 20, 2019: [Stipulation]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • January 29, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • January 29, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order]
  • November 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 21, 2018: [Pretrial Conference - Interim]
  • November 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 31, 2018: [Witness List]
  • October 29, 2018: [Witness List]
  • October 29, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • October 29, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 10, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order]
  • August 28, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 28, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 08, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 04, 2018: [Order]
  • May 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 19, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 19, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 16, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 09, 2018: [Docket Entry Order to File Lodged Document]
  • March 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice to Take Deposition]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Order]
  • July 07, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2017
  • May 15, 2017: [Order]
  • May 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2017: [Stipulation]
February, 2017
  • February 23, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 08, 2016: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 08, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 14, 2016: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 08, 2016: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 08, 2016: [Discovery Plan]
  • November 08, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2016: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Disclosure Statement]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Errata]
  • March 22, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • February 23, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 23, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 22, 2016: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • February 22, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 18, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 12, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • January 19, 2016: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
November, 2015
  • November 30, 2015: [Receipt]
  • November 09, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2015
  • October 08, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 08, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 08, 2015: [Complaint]
  • October 08, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 08, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.