U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00475
  • Case Name: Hopkins v. Nakamoto et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Reference]
October, 2015
  • October 22, 2015: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 13, 2015: [Order]
  • October 13, 2015: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2015: [Withdraw Reference]
  • October 08, 2015: [Response to Motion]
  • October 08, 2015: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.