U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cv-00476
  • Case Name: Bernovich v. Colvin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 07, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 06, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • June 14, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Reply (generic)]
  • September 01, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 01, 2016: [Declaration]
  • August 01, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Administrative Record]
  • May 31, 2016: [Answer to Petition for Review]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Consents (All are in)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Consent Filed]
  • March 08, 2016: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • March 07, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 09, 2015: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • October 09, 2015: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 09, 2015: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 09, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 08, 2015: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • October 08, 2015: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.