U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00459
  • Case Name: Cook v. The Amalgamated Sugar Company, L.L.C.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • September 09, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 18, 2016: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 04, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 15, 2016: [Stipulation]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order]
  • June 23, 2016: [Stipulation]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Order]
  • November 23, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 19, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2015
  • October 27, 2015: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 23, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 20, 2015: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • October 19, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 19, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 09, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.