U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00480
  • Case Name: Aspen Residential Services v. Gustafson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2015
  • October 23, 2015: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • October 23, 2015: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 20, 2015: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 13, 2015: [Supplement]
  • October 09, 2015: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • October 09, 2015: [Notice of Removal]
  • October 09, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 09, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.