U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00479
  • Case Name: Dunn v. Hatch et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2020
  • January 17, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 09, 2020: [USCA Order]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [USCA Order]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Appeal Transcript]
  • June 22, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 22, 2018: [Appeal Transcript Request]
  • June 15, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Cross Appeal]
  • June 06, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Judgment - Attorney Fees]
  • May 23, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 19, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 06, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 23, 2018: [Declaration]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 15, 2017: [Bench Trial - Begun]
  • November 13, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • November 10, 2017: [Entry of Judgment]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • November 08, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 07, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • November 07, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2017: [Declaration]
  • November 01, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • October 30, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 23, 2017: [Objection]
  • October 20, 2017: [Sanctions]
  • October 18, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 16, 2017: [In Limine]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • October 16, 2017: [Trial Brief]
  • October 06, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 06, 2017: [Transcript]
  • October 02, 2017: [Errata]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 27, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 27, 2017: [Order]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 14, 2017: [Entry of Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Order]
  • May 08, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • September 02, 2016: [Strike]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 14, 2016: [Strike]
  • June 13, 2016: [Errata]
  • June 08, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 13, 2016: [Strike]
April, 2016
  • April 26, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 01, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • April 01, 2016: [Errata]
  • April 01, 2016: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2016: [Dismiss]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [ADR Plan]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2016: [Corrective Entry]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 12, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Order]
  • December 08, 2015: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 04, 2015: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 04, 2015: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 02, 2015: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
November, 2015
  • November 09, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • November 04, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 09, 2015: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 09, 2015: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.