U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cv-00481
  • Case Name: TRC Fabrication, LLC v. Okland Construction Company, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 11, 2016: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Order]
  • January 05, 2016: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
December, 2015
  • December 24, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 17, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • December 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 16, 2015: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • December 15, 2015: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 07, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 03, 2015: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2015
  • November 17, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
  • November 17, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • November 02, 2015: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 30, 2015: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 14, 2015: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.