U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00483
  • Case Name: Higgins v. Blades
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
October, 2019
  • October 11, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Reopening Case]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Letter]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Reopen Case]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: [Stay]
October, 2015
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 14, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 14, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 14, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.