U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:15-cv-00484
  • Case Name: Jimenez v. Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 15, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 19, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 21, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • August 18, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2017
  • July 11, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2017
  • January 12, 2017: [Hearing]
  • January 12, 2017: [Remand]
  • January 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Request]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2015
  • December 28, 2015: [Reopen Case]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • December 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2015
  • October 28, 2015: [Consent Filed]
  • October 28, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 14, 2015: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • October 14, 2015: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 14, 2015: [Stay]
  • October 14, 2015: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • October 14, 2015: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • October 14, 2015: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.